NATURE IN ART TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust owns and manages a museum, Nature in Art, Gloucester, for the public good
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 October 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Walkden | Chair | 21 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Lark Briggs | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Temblett | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Haydn Jones | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Turner | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
OLIVER LEIGH-WOOD | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|||||
RUNGWE KINGDON | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr TIMOTHY JOHN BRAIN OBE QPM | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Ben Ash | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jayne Butler | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
LINDA BENNETT | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM JAMES EYKYN FCA | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
JONNY TYERS | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £266.43k | £267.69k | £240.43k | £244.42k | £324.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £242.29k | £238.62k | £236.14k | £269.02k | £322.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £122.19k | £16.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13TH AUGUST 1990
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND KNOWLEDGE OF THE PUBLIC IN THE WORKS OF WILDLIFE ARTISTS AND SCULPTORS AND OTHER ARTISTS AND CRAFTSMEN AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE EXHIBITION OF THE WORKS OF WILDLIFE ARTISTS AND SCULPTORS AND IN THE SCIENCE OF BIOLOGY GENERALLY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
NATURE IN ART
WALLSWORTH HALL
SANDHURST LANE
SANDHURST
GLOUCESTER
GL2 9PA
- Phone:
- 01452731422
- Email:
- enquiries@natureinart.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window