SEVERN GORGE COUNTRYSIDE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust manages land in the Ironbridge Gorge for the benefit of local people and for the benefit of visitors to the Gorge to balance public access, landscape, nature conservation, safeguarding historic and cultural features, with public engagement and developing awareness and knowledge of the Trust and its work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £36,007 from 2 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 08 October 1991: Standard registration
- SGCT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maureen Bragg | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Paul Anthony Davis | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Boylan | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Emma BAGNALL | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Thomas Michael Burton | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan John Taylor | Trustee | 17 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
MAXWELL SPEKE | Trustee | 22 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS DENNIS DOWNES | Trustee |
|
||||||
CAROLYN HEALY | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN DUDLEY BOX | Trustee |
|
||||||
GINA HEATHER DIANA ROWE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £376.85k | £307.66k | £287.55k | £327.89k | £345.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £358.61k | £318.79k | £327.75k | £363.83k | £339.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £73.38k | N/A | £16.20k | £14.64k | £36.01k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 SEPTEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 JUNE 2009 AS AMENDED 27 NOVEMBER 2013 as amended on 19 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE MAINTAIN PRESERVE AND MANAGE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AREAS OF COUNTRYSIDE INCLUDING WOODLANDS OPEN SPACE AND OTHER LANDS WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
THE AREA OF THE SEVERN GORGE IN BRIDGNORTH AND THE WREKIN
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Severn Gorge Countryside Trust
Darby Road
Coalbrookdale
Telford
TF8 7EP
- Phone:
- 01952433880
- Email:
- staff@severngorge.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window