STOUGHTON VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1006775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity has a long lease of the village hall which is centrally situated in the village of Stoughton. It is available for use by the entire community irrespective of religious beliefs; sexual orientation; and is available to people of all ages. Apart from the parish church there is no other meeting place in the village as there are no shops, school or public house.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £5,807
Total expenditure: £3,639

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 December 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ann Carolyn Hollingworth Chair
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LUKE, THURNBY, LEICESTER
Received: On time
ZOUCH AND BEAUMONT STOUGHTON CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
William Richmond Trustee 12 July 2024
SUE YOUNG CANCER SUPPORT IN LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND
Received: On time
ZOUCH AND BEAUMONT STOUGHTON CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
Anne Piechota Trustee 30 August 2022
None on record
Ben Phelpstead Trustee 21 July 2021
None on record
Kirsty Mohka Trustee 21 July 2021
None on record
JUNE SPARROW Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.61k £13.84k £5.05k £3.37k £5.81k
Total expenditure £5.23k £6.73k £3.64k £1.47k £3.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
36 GAULBY LANE
STOUGHTON
LEICESTER
LE2 2FL
Phone:
01162710278
Website:

Stoughton.village.hall