lps21 ltd

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education for the public benefit through the promotion of the artswith particular, but not exclusive, reference to the visual arts of printmaking and graphic design.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 December 1991: Standard registration
- LPS (Working name)
- LONDON PRINT STUDIO (Previous name)
- LONDON PRINT WORKSHOP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr David Dawson Ferry | Chair | 29 April 2021 |
|
|||||||||
David William Logan Westhead | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Anthony Downing | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Noel Anthony Godber | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Maike Naho Matsuda | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £283.56k | £756.18k | £3.37k | £1.24k | £3.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £292.45k | £229.48k | £69.57k | £38.91k | £34.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £168.61k | £161.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £1.86k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £1.76k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £104.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £127 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £648.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £227.36k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £2.12k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 March 2024 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/07/1990 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/04/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/02/2011 as amended on 26 Jul 2021 as amended on 13 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS WITH PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE REFERENCE TO THE VISUAL ARTS OF PRINTING AND GRAPHIC DESIGN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Fairbarn Road
Sheffield
South Yorkshire
S6 5PP
- Phone:
- 07932060801
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window