LEICESTERSHIRE CHORALE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is a mixed chamber choir. Five to six choral concerts are performed annually. Every year the Charity makes grants to deserving young candidates following acceptance into the Choir as choral scholars.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leicestershire
- Rutland
Governance
- 29 January 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Silje Haarr | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Michael Leech | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Daniel Chinery | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roger Sydney William Wilson | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|||||
NEIL WADDELL | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jeanne Simpson | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Cook | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.92k | £15.70k | £17.84k | £20.13k | £20.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.92k | £9.99k | £17.11k | £24.60k | £22.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 SEPTEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14 OCT 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The New House
Station Road
Upper Broughton
MELTON MOWBRAY
Leicestershire
LE14 3BQ
- Phone:
- 01664 822602
- Email:
- ub3wilsons@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window