THE TRUAN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Truan Trust offers support to young people to receive an education in Uganda. Funding is provided to assist youngsters to obtain an education who do not have any family support, such as orphans through AIDS, or where the family can only offer part support e.g. children of peasant farmers. At present most support is given to students studying at secondary or in post-secondary education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Uganda
Governance
- 17 February 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN WILLIAM TRUAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Solomon Truan Osinde | Trustee | 09 August 2014 |
|
|
||||||
STEPHEN JOHN COPELAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Alison Gowman | Trustee |
|
||||||||
SUSAN LESLEY EBSWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.66k | £42.56k | £27.33k | £26.69k | £26.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.24k | £18.52k | £22.72k | £36.19k | £35.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 25 April 2024 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 25 April 2024 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 06 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 06 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED 17TH DECEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Elmdale
Peldon Road
Little Wigborough
Essex
CO5 7RB
- Phone:
- 07814544629
- Email:
- steve.copeland1@icloud.com
- Website:
-
truantrust.wordpress.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window