SWANSEA VALE RAILWAY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1012356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The preservation and restoration of heritage railway artefacts, especially those relating to the former railways of the lower Swansea valley and South West Wales. The society acts as an umbrella organisation for a variety of interest groups with similar aims and objectives to the Swansea Vale Railway Society.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £279
Total expenditure: £130

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 June 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
EMLYN WILLIAMS Chair
None on record
Kyle Chalmers Trustee 03 September 2018
None on record
Christopher Bowen Trustee 03 September 2018
None on record
Rev Ian David Morris Trustee
CAERAU DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
THE CHRISTIAN CENTRE FOR RURAL WALES
Received: On time
THE PONTARDDULAIS PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
METHODIST CHURCH IN WALES - WALES SYNOD CYMRU
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £424 £180 £138 £280 £279
Total expenditure £45 £0 £0 £150 £130
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 GLASFRYN ROAD
PONTARDDULAIS
SWANSEA
SA4 8LL
Phone:
07857650426
Email:
No information available
Website:

swanseavalerailway.co.uk