J B HARLEY RESEARCH FELLOWSHIPS TRUST

Charity number: 1012583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Awarding grants

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £1,750
Total expenditure: £6,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 July 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Veronica Della Dora Trustee 03 February 2022
None on record
Dr ALEXANDER JAMES KENT Trustee 25 February 2021
THE CHARLES CLOSE SOCIETY FOR THE STUDY OF ORDNANCE SURVEY MAPS
Received: On time
Nicholas Alan Millea Trustee 25 February 2021
None on record
Thomas Wiliam Harper Trustee 02 December 2016
None on record
Professor Michael Heffernan Trustee 01 December 2016
None on record
Dr Alison Sarah Bendall Trustee
None on record
Peter Michael Barber Trustee
MEMORIAL SCROLLS TRUST
Received: On time
LAUDERDALE HOUSE SOCIETY LTD
Received: On time
IMAGO MUNDI
Received: On time
Dr ELIZABETH BAIGENT Trustee
FRIENDS OF THE YOUNG MUSICIANS' ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
PROF ROGER JAMES PETER KAIN Trustee
IMAGO MUNDI
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £2.28k £2.94k £7.97k £3.00k £1.75k
Total expenditure £5.03k £5.00k £5.00k £6.04k £6.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 26 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 17 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 29 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 09 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 07 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Dr A S Bendall
Emmanuel College
CB2 3AP
Phone:
01223 330987
Website:

No information available