THE PHILOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Society are to investigate and promote the study and knowledge of the structure, the affinities and the history of languages. To this end it organises regular meetings and conferences, publishes a journal and supports the publication of academic books.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

30 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 October 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
30 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Victor ACEDO-MATELLAN | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hannah Cameron Gibson | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jeremy John Smith | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dunstan Patrick Brown | Trustee | 08 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Paul Russell | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tine Alice Alberte An Breban | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ADAM NOEL LEDGEWAY | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michele Bianconi | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Krishnan Jesse Ram-Prasad | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laura Rudall Bailey | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nikolas Simon Gisborne | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard William Dance | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Brechtje Maria Bowine Post | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kersti Elisabeth Borjars | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Belgrave Lucas | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sara Maria Pons-Sanz | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Patrick George Honeybone | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
PROF KLAUS FISCHER | Trustee | 15 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Graham Pointon | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jennifer Lilian Cheshire | Trustee | 16 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ranjan Sen | Trustee | 13 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kathryn Louise Allan | Trustee | 13 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Susan Mary Fitzmaurice | Trustee | 13 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Lutz Marten | Trustee | 16 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Melanie Jane Green | Trustee | 11 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR NIGEL BRUCE VINCENT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR ADITI LAHIRI | Trustee |
|
||||||
PROFESSOR SYLVIA ADAMSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR NICHOLAS JOHN SIMS-WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR WENDY AYRES-BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.96k | £86.39k | £79.74k | £83.30k | £88.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.07k | £55.51k | £64.54k | £47.43k | £87.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 DECEMBER 1878 AMENDED ON 8 MAY 1992 AMENDED ON 7TH MAY 1999
Charitable objects
TO INVESTIGATE AND PROMOTE THE STUDY AND KNOWLEDGE OF THE STRUCTURES THE AFFINITIES AND THE HISTORY OF LANGUAGES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Bell Yard
London
WC2A 2JR
- Phone:
- 07717337083
- Email:
- secretary@philsoc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window