MITSUBISHI CORPORATION FUND FOR EUROPE AND AFRICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the MCFEA are to promote environmental conservation, environmental education and research, and the alleviation of poverty in Africa and Europe. These objectives are achieved through grant-making to charities and NGOs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of London
- Ethiopia
- Ivory Coast
- Kenya
- Nigeria
- South Africa
- Tanzania
Governance
- 07 October 1992: Standard registration
- MCFEA (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIE ROGERS | Chair |
|
||||||||
Tetsuya Shinohara | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|||||||
Takashi Hirose | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|||||||
Takehiro Fujimura | Trustee | 14 April 2025 |
|
|||||||
Yukihiko Kaburaki | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|||||||
Kyoko Takeuchi | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £310.60k | £330.27k | £330.27k | £269.40k | £309.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £312.55k | £329.17k | £329.17k | £268.40k | £312.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 SEPTEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 2 JULY 2009.
Charitable objects
1)TO CONSERVE AND PROTECT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE ENVIRONMENT AS A WHOLE AND ITS ANIMAL FOREST AND PLANT LIFE IN PARTICULAR AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN NATURAL HISTORY ABD ECOLOGY AND THE IMPORTANCE OF CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT 2)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING I)TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN THE FIELD OF ECOLOGY AND CONSERVATION OF NATURAL RESOURSES AND THE ENVIRONMENT ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD II)TO PROMOTE THE STUDY AND APPRECIATION OF FLORA AND FAUNA ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON ENDANGERED SPECIES III)TO PROMOTE THE STUDY AND APPRECIATION OF AGRICULTURE HORTICULTURE SILVICULTURE AND LAND AND ESTATE MANAGEMENT 3)TO RELIEVE POBERTY IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MITSUBISHI CORPORATION
INTERNATIONAL PLC
MID CITY PLACE
71 HIGH HOLBORN
LONDON
WC1V 6BA
- Phone:
- 020 7025 3000
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window