LEA VALLEY UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Continuing training and education for persons either retired or semi-retired in areas such as arts/culture and sport/recreation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 17 February 1994: Standard registration
- L V U 3 A (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Glynis Evans | Chair | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Cordina | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Edington | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Scott Miller | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Robinson | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Diana Robinson | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marion Barrett | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
LEONE JEANNE RAYNER | Trustee | 09 October 2017 |
|
|||||
ALAN COLE | Trustee | 13 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MILLS | Trustee | 17 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.95k | £8.54k | £9.00k | £10.63k | £11.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.11k | £11.30k | £11.70k | £10.11k | £13.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH DECEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED 12 MAY 1997 AND 9 OCTOBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 05 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
BROXBOURNE AND THE SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Buryholme
BROXBOURNE
Hertfordshire
EN10 6PE
- Phone:
- 01992 465462
- Email:
- secretarylvu3a@outlook.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window