STONE PUBLISHING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the christian faith through publications, support for translations and free distribution of literature. Publication of christian magazine "Youthful Days".
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Burma
- Malawi
- Zambia
Governance
- 08 March 1994: Standard registration
- 12 July 2022: Funds received from 257972 IDA MORTLOCK SADLER TRUST
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith John Parkin | Trustee | 31 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Hollands | Trustee | 31 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philip John Coldrick | Trustee | 31 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ERIC MCPHAIL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN BURR | Trustee |
|
||||||
KEITH HOGARTH WICKENS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £390.49k | £40.62k | £112.46k | £23.79k | £11.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.49k | £36.09k | £55.64k | £72.50k | £74.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 7TH DECEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE CHRISTIAN RELIGION WORLD WIDE
Area of benefit
WORDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 ORMOND CRESCENT
HAMPTON
TW12 2TH
- Phone:
- 02089791050
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window