THE ALTON UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education of older members of society
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 18 March 1994: Standard registration
- U3A ALTON (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Penelope Jane Peters | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane Johnston | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Turner | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Kenneth Robb | Trustee | 16 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Eileen Janet Fawcett | Trustee | 17 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Aiken | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Britchford | Trustee | 16 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Ian Bartholomew | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Trevor Cooper | Trustee | 10 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.76k | £4.23k | £35.78k | £41.54k | £69.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.65k | £5.78k | £31.52k | £48.89k | £52.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 DECEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF MIDDLE AGED AND OLDER PEOPLE WHO ARE NOT IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT IN ALTON AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY. 2) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE ALTON AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Alton Community Centre
Amery Street
ALTON
Hampshire
GU34 1HN
- Phone:
- 0142089341
- Email:
- alton.u3a.sec@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window