EMPOWERME
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of eMpowerMe is to promote, develop and support mental health service user involvement throughout the community. We provide an alternative choice to statutory services, support and develop service user groups, support and develops projects to address unmet needs, as well as providing comprehensive training on mental health awareness to voluntary and statutory groups and organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lancashire
Governance
- 25 August 1994: Standard registration
- 30 March 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 30 March 2015: Funds transferred to 702233 COMMUNITY COUNCIL OF LANCASHIRE
- LANCASHIRE ADVOCACY (Working name)
- LANCASHIRE ADVOCACY DEVELOPMENT AND SUPPORT SERVICE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.03k | £102.21k | £169.54k | £153.87k | £166.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144.63k | £111.16k | £125.23k | £126.87k | £173.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 12 November 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 04 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 21 September 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JUNE 1994 AS AMENDED 5TH JUNE 1996 AND 23 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
PROMOTE AND SUPPORT SERVICES FOR GROUPS OF PEOPLE OR INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED BY DISABILITY, ILLNESS OR BEING AGED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window