BOTELER EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust financially supports a number of educational projects at Sir Thomas Boteler CE High School as well as providing grants, where appropraite, to individual pupils who require financial assistance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warrington
Governance
- 19 September 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev William Matthews | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Robert Penn | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Cllr Stephen Patrick Wright | Trustee | 25 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR PETER WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANN TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HANS MUNDRY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.19k | £75.24k | £68.11k | £71.65k | £78.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £285.05k | £277.17k | £44.62k | £43.18k | £47.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 20 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 12 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 26 JUL 1994 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 03 AUG 2003 AS AMENDED ON 01 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED ON 14 AUG 2019
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR THE SCHOOL, INCLUDING MAKING PAYMENTS TO THE GOVERNORS OF THE SCHOOL TO BE USED BY THEM IN DISCHARGING THEIR OBLIGATIONS UNDER THE EDUCATION ACTS WITH RESPECT TO THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
THE BOROUGH OF WARRINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sir Thomas Boteler CE High School
Grammar School Road
WARRINGTON
WA4 1JL
- Phone:
- 07885499544
- Email:
- carsten@kressel.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window