THE FRIENDS OF ELSTOW ABBEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Contributes towards the upkeep, maintenance and conservation of the structure & fabrics of the Abbey Church of St.Mary and St.Helena, Elstow. To this end, commissions work or goods, or makes grants to the Parochial Church Council, at their request. Raises funds via membership subscriptions, fund-raising events, donations & bequests, "Small Society" lotteries, trading activities and seeking grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 14 February 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN HENRY STANFORD | Chair | 10 May 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
MR RAFF MAROTTA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
CHARLES EDWARD SAMUEL WHITBREAD | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
TRACEY HINSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.54k | £514 | £2.56k | £1.22k | £5.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £862 | £0 | £3.53k | £46 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 NOVEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION REPAIR MAINTENANCE RESTORATION IMPROVEMENT AND ORNAMENTATION OF THE FABRIC OF ELSTOW ABBEY BEING THE PARISH CHURCH OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ELSTOW AFORESAID "FABRIC" IS DEFINED TO INCLUDE THE CHURCH ORGAN BELLS ELECTRICAL WIRING HEATING INSTALLATION AND THE ECCLESIASTICAL FURNISHINGS AND FITTINGS
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ELSTOW BEDFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O THE ABBEY RECTORY
CHURCH END
ELSTOW
BEDS
MK42 9XT
- Phone:
- 01234261477
- Email:
- friends@elstow-abbey.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window