3.13

Charity Number: 1044311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

WE OFFER HOUSING & SUPPORT TO HOMELESS YOUNG MEN IN STOCKTON-ON-TEES WITH VARIOUS PROBLEMS WHICH CAN INCLUDE DRUG AND ALCOHOL MISUSE. WE TRY TO HELP OUR RESIDENTS TO BECOME DRUG FREE AND LIVE INDEPENDENTLY THROUGH HELP AND SUPPORT. WE SEPARATELY OPERATE A RESIDENTIAL FAMILY ASSESSMENT CENTRE AT OUR FARM IN BISHOP AUCKLAND.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £403,425
Total expenditure: £547,358

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Durham
  • Stockton-on-tees

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 February 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • TURNAROUND HOMES (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL John WINSTONE Chair 04 January 1994
THE HOPE FOUNDATION LIMITED
Received: On time
HARRY WRIGGLESWORTH Trustee 14 June 2004
None on record
MR CHRIS TAYLOR Trustee 04 January 1994
FOODBANK FOR WHITBY AND DISTRICT
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £380.55k £334.26k £373.37k £418.77k £403.43k
Total expenditure £325.49k £373.74k £439.31k £424.94k £547.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £373.37k £407.67k £401.76k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 01 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 01 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 20 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 18 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 18 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 20 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 12 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 Maria Drive
Stockton-on-Tees
TS19 7JL
Phone:
07774957106
Website:

No information available