ROCHDALE BOROUGH SHOPMOBILITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SHOPMOBILITY PROVIDES MANUAL AND POWERED WHEELCHAIRS,POWERED SCOOTERS AND VOLUNTEER ESCORTS TO HELP PEOPLE WHO HAVE LIMITED MOBILITY SHOP WITH EASE AND ENJOYMENT IN ROCHDALE TOWN CENTRE. IT IS FOR ANYONE REGARDLESS OF AGE WHETHER THEIR DISABILITY IS TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT. SHOPMOBILITY ALSO PROVIDES ESCORTS FOR PEOPLE WITH SENSORY DIFFICULTIES TO HELP WITH SHOPPING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £35,600 from 1 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Rochdale
Governance
- 29 June 1995: Standard registration
- MIDDLETON SHOPMOBILITY (Working name)
- ROCHDALE SHOPMOBILITY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLLR ASHLEY DEARNLEY | Chair | 14 February 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Cllr Billy Sheerin | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Houston | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Janice Coventry | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Ambrose | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Christine Berry | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
CLLR JAMES GARTSIDE | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|||||||
PATRICIA BOYLAN | Trustee | 23 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.41k | £52.29k | £29.79k | £59.05k | £41.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.73k | £42.83k | £40.52k | £59.03k | £37.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £35.60k | |
|
Income from government grants | £24.95k | £42.42k | £24.95k | £37.60k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JUNE 1995 AS AMENDED ON 19 NOVEMBER 1996, 9 NOVEMBER 2000, 27 FEBRUARY 2002, 20 JULY 2005 AND 27 SEPTEMBER 2006. as amended on 11 Oct 2017 as amended on 26 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS,IN PARTICULAR THE DISABLED THE SICK OR THE AGED WHO HAVE LIMITED MOBILITY, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY THE PROVISION OF WHEELCHAIRS AND SIMILAR EQUIPMENT WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR MOBILITY AND THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF ROCHDALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 River Street
Rochdale
Greater Manchester
OL16 1JY
- Phone:
- 01706861626
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window