NORTH WALES CAVE RESCUE ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
North Wales Cave Rescue Organisation provides an underground rescue service for caves and disused mines in North Wales in support of North Wales Police, who initiate all rescue callouts. Our activities include responding to rescue callouts from the Police, training our members and maintaining our equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Gwynedd
- Isle Of Anglesey
- Wrexham
Governance
- 15 February 1996: Standard registration
- NWCRO (Working name)
- TIM ACHUB OGOF GOGLEDD CYMRU (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gareth Mark Stonely | Trustee | 23 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Seren Emily Stacey-Jones | Trustee | 23 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tom Howard | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margo Heleen Saher | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Robert Haigh | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Robin Geraint Jones | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joel Christopher Elliott Whitaker | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Edward Alan Lockhart | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dewi lloyd | Trustee | 24 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT PAUL SHEPPARD | Trustee | 17 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
KATRINA HAWKINS | Trustee | 24 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.61k | £1.61k | £2.21k | £1.32k | £3.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.22k | £2.44k | £2.60k | £1.53k | £4.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 JULY 1995 AS AMENDED 11 JANUARY 1996 as amended on 23 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND LIFE OF PERSONS AND ANIMALS INJURED OR STRANDED EITHER ABOVE OR BELOW GROUND BY CARRYING OUT RESCUE OPERATIONS AND TO ASSIST THE POLICE IN THESE AND SIMILAR ACTIVITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE N WALES AND MERSEYSIDE POLICE AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROCK FARM
EGLWYSEG
LLANGOLLEN
LL20 8EH
- Phone:
- 01978861036
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window