Trustees THE COBNOR ACTIVITIES CENTRE TRUST
Charity number: 1057222
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW DAVID WRIGHT | Chair | 31 August 2012 |
|
|
||||||
James Gerard Lavery | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Philip Tyler | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jeremy Nicholas Drummond | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
MARTIN STUART BLACKWELL | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Ruairidh Ian MacKenzie | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Paul Camps | Trustee | 26 January 2018 |
|
|||||||
ELIZABETH SIOBHAN RUSHALL | Trustee | 26 January 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.