THE SHEFFIELD AND DISTRICT ORGANISTS AND CHOIRMASTERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arrange and present public lectures,discussions,and debates; public demonstrations of instruments; public demonstration of music for organ and voices; open competitions for the playing,singing and composition of liturgical and organ music; public meetings to facilitate exchange of views concerned with liturgical and organ music matters; advice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Nottinghamshire
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 18 September 1996: Standard registration
- SADOCA (Working name)
- SHEFFIELD AND DISTRICT ORGANISTS AND CHOIRMASTERS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joshua Thomas Stephens | Trustee | 22 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM WILKINSON | Trustee | 21 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr SIMON GEOFFREY LINDLEY FRCO | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|||||
MALCOLM RICHARD NORTH | Trustee | 22 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL WILLIAM CLARK | Trustee | 11 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROY CHAMBERLIN | Trustee | 17 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DAVID ROCH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £850 | £145 | £90 | £250 | £150 | |
|
Total expenditure | £550 | £300 | £215 | £519 | £863 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 01 September 2024 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 01 September 2024 | 490 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 September 2024 | 855 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 May 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/09/1978 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14/02/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDY OF THE ART OF MUSIC WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO LITURGICAL AND ORGAN MUSIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 PINE CROFT
CHAPELTOWN
SHEFFIELD
S35 1EB
- Phone:
- 01142464369
- Email:
- mail@jdroch.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window