THE FRIENDS OF HYLANDS HOUSE

Charity Number: 1059969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the Friends shall be the preservation and improvement of the listed building - Hylands House, Chelmsford - together with the associated park, for the benefit of the public and the promotion of its use by the public, through the activities of a group of friends.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £25,432
Total expenditure: £13,844

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 January 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mrs Chris Rycroft Chair 11 April 2017
None on record
Alan Michael Mayo Trustee 02 January 2024
None on record
Valerie Chiswell Trustee 12 March 2023
GREAT BADDOW PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
MRS H PUGH FOR SUNDAY OR DAY SCHOOLS
Received: On time
DEAN BRAMSTON'S CHARITY
Received: On time
ROTARY CLUB OF CHELMSFORD MILDMAY TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Nicholas Paul Wickenden MA,AMA,FSA Trustee 02 August 2021
COLCHESTER ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
COLCHESTER MUSEUMS DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE ESSEX SOCIETY FOR ARCHAEOLOGY AND HISTORY
Received: On time
RICHARD OSCROFT MBE Trustee 02 August 2021
None on record
Beryle May Cornell Trustee 02 August 2021
None on record
Ann Elizabeth Bell Trustee 16 July 2019
THE U3A CHELMSFORD
Received: On time
South Thames Colleges Group Educational Trust
Received: On time
MUSEUM OF POWER
Received: On time
Cynthia Jacqueline Walker Trustee 11 April 2017
None on record
MRS ROS COLERIDGE Trustee
None on record
MR STAN KALUZA Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £31.06k £13.34k £16.02k £40.03k £25.43k
Total expenditure £48.83k £39.88k £13.12k £30.07k £13.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
28 BRITTEN CRESCENT
CHELMSFORD
CM2 7ER
Phone:
01245609508