BERRYMAN ANNUITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principle objective of the charity is to pay Annuities to unmarried or widowed women baptised of the Church of England. Investments are used to fund current and future annuities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Somerset
Governance
- 07 February 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Samuel Denyer | Chair | 08 May 2017 |
|
|||||
ANNE MELVILLE SCOTT | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE TAYLOR | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
MRS ANN EDMONDS | Trustee | 13 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA YVONNE JENKINS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.67k | £18.44k | £16.73k | £19.15k | £19.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.00k | £20.03k | £15.90k | £22.00k | £22.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 08 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED ON 31/03/1941 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 30/09/1965 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 17/02/1971 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 31/03/1980 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 23/11/1999
Charitable objects
PROVIDING ANNUITIES NOT EXCEEDING $100 EACH TO GENTLEWOMEN WHO ARE AND REMAIN SPINSTERS OR WIDOWS WHO HAVE NOT AN INCOME EXCEEDING $500 PER ANNUM OR SUCH OTHER AMOUNT AS THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS APPROVE FROM TIME TO TIME (EXCLUSIVE OF THE ANNUITY) AND ARE BAPTISED MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PARISH OFFICE
St. Cuthberts Church
St. Cuthbert Street
WELLS
BA5 2AW
- Phone:
- 01749676906
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window