LOUISA MARTHA MINSHULL CHARITY

Charity number: 203096
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Makes grants to individuals

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £32
Total expenditure: £32

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 March 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nigel White Trustee 14 May 2024
None on record
Gillian Newbold Trustee 01 February 2023
None on record
Timothy Hammond Trustee 01 February 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY CHOLSEY
Received: On time
REBECCA LOUISE THOMASSON BA HONS Trustee 26 April 2015
None on record
Rev Rebecca Peters Trustee
DIDCOT AND WALLINGFORD AREA CAP DEBT CENTRE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY CHOLSEY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £28 £30 £30 £30 £32
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £32
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 November 2022 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE VICARAGE
CHURCH ROAD
CHOLSEY
WALLINGFORD
OX10 9PP
Phone:
01491651216
Website:

No information available