TRURO MUNICIPAL CHARITIES

Charity Number: 204324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of almshouses for elderly people Relief of poverty or hardship with small grants

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £16,835
Total expenditure: £17,544

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 February 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID VICTOR FLEXMAN Chair
None on record
Sarah Wetherill Trustee 25 January 2018
None on record
LOIC RICH Trustee 17 May 2017
CORNWALL INDEPENDENT POVERTY FORUM
Received: On time
CHRISTOPHER HUGH WELLS Trustee
CHARITY OF ANNIE CRAGOE FOR KENWYN CHURCHYARD AND CHURCH
Received: On time
YOUNG PEOPLE CORNWALL
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KENWYN WITH ST ALLEN
Received: On time
NEW BEGINNING COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (MALABAR)
Received: On time
DAVID JOSEPH HODGE Trustee
None on record
MRS MARGARET SELLWOOD Trustee
None on record
ANDREW ROBINSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.18k £18.13k £16.52k £16.98k £16.84k
Total expenditure £11.91k £9.75k £12.85k £14.56k £17.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 25 OCTOBER 1972
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF TRURO WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS PREFERENCE TO POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. CLEMENT, TRURO.
Area of benefit
CITY OF TRURO AND ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST CLEMENT, TRURO
Registration history
  • 28 February 1962 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
WHEELWRIGHT COTTAGE
13 Chacewater Hill
Chacewater
TRURO
TR4 8QB
Phone:
07977561933
Website:

No information available