JOHN SAYER ALMSHOUSES

Charity Number: 208191
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The running of almshouses for single women in need who are resident in or have connections with the area of benefit (the town of Berkhamsted and its surrounding area).

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £49,910
Total expenditure: £40,401

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 July 1962: Standard registration
  • 17 July 2007: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 17 July 2007: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BERKHAMSTED ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITIES (Working name)
  • RICHARD BALSHAW (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sandra Kurth Trustee 06 December 2023
None on record
Peter Shell Trustee 21 November 2023
None on record
Emma Jayne Williams Trustee 27 June 2023
None on record
Rev Stuart James Owen Trustee 02 May 2023
SALTER EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 474 days
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, GREAT BERKHAMSTED
Received: On time
THE GIRLS' SPECIAL INSTRUCTION FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days
BOURNE'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 474 days
ANGLICAN METHODIST ASSOCIATION (BERKHAMSTED) LIMITED
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S GREAT BERKHAMSTED
Received: On time
SIR HENRY ATKINS
Received: On time
BOURNES ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 839 days
Richard William James Currie Trustee 22 November 2022
SIR HENRY ATKINS
Received: On time
Diane Jennifer Skidmore Trustee 22 November 2022
None on record
Edward Meade Hatley Trustee 28 April 2020
SIR HENRY ATKINS
Received: On time
COMMODORE TIM HENNESSEY Trustee 21 May 2015
BOURNE'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 474 days
BOURNES ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 839 days
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, GREAT BERKHAMSTED
Received: On time
NICOLA DONNA BEADLE Trustee
SIR HENRY ATKINS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £15.59k £11.95k £19.08k £43.19k £49.91k
Total expenditure £6.81k £36.65k £42.69k £50.32k £40.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 28 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 31 MARCH 1965 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 17 MAY 1990
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH POOR PERSON OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF BERKHAMSTED ST PETER WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF BERKHAMSTED ST PETER
Registration history
  • 12 July 1962 : Standard registration
  • 17 July 2007 : Removed
  • 17 July 2007 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
11 Kingsdale Road
BERKHAMSTED
Hertfordshire
HP4 3BS
Phone:
07900 409399