THE HAMPTON WAR MEMORIAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide accommodation for men and women who have served in H M Forces
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 19 November 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DEREK NEIL WINTERBURN BSC MA | Chair |
|
||||||||||
Ronald Pettit | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|||||||||
SARAH SELVANATHAN | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Rev DONNA WILLIAMS | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|||||||||
PAULA WILLIAMS | Trustee | 31 March 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Dr DAVID WILE | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Rev BEN LOVELL | Trustee | 18 September 2017 |
|
|||||||||
STUART NIGEL LEAMY | Trustee | 26 June 2017 |
|
|||||||||
JOHN SOONES JP | Trustee | 01 May 2012 |
|
|||||||||
ANNE WALKER | Trustee | 01 May 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
MRS S NICHOLSON | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
BARBARA ANNE HEALEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.14k | £64.79k | £26.62k | £28.46k | £33.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.77k | £19.75k | £18.47k | £21.56k | £13.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF HIGH COURT 3RD APRIL, 1944. AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 11TH APRIL 1979
Charitable objects
OCCUPATION OF FOUR COTTAGES IN OLDFIELD ROAD, HAMPTON BY EX-SERVICEMEN OR WIDOWS AND IN DEFAULT DESERVING POOR PERSONS WHO FOR NOT LESS THAN 3 YEARS HAVE RESIDED WITHIN THE AREA FORMERLY INCLUDED IN THE URBAN DISTRICT OF HAMPTON MIDDLESEX.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAMPTON WAR MEMORIAL CHARITY
1A JUBILEE HOUSE
ASHLEY ROAD
HAMPTON
MIDDLESEX
TW12 2HX
- Phone:
- 02089412016
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window