ROYAL SOCIETY OF SCULPTORS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Established over 100 years ago, the Society promotes excellence in the art and practice of sculpture. It aims to inspire, inform and engage everyone with sculpture and to support sculptors' development of their practice to the highest professional standards.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £25,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 January 1963: Standard registration
- 23 November 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- R B S (Working name)
- ROYAL BRITISH SOCIETY OF SCULPTORS (Previous name)
- ROYAL SOCIETY OF BRITISH SCULPTORS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Ford | Chair | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eugene Nyee Macki | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS HORNBY | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Andrew Stonyer | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Reeves | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Geile | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Beyer | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA NEWNHAM | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
MarK Lowrie Burch | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Almuth Tebbenhoff VPRBS | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Watson | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Edwina Sassoon | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Bill Price | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £466.06k | £356.80k | £651.76k | £602.18k | £410.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £370.98k | £297.26k | £314.01k | £289.07k | £407.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £25.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £387.22k | £492.40k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £101.13k | £96.25k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £48.82k | £3.92k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £36 | £928 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £114.56k | £8.69k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £291.61k | £265.70k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £19.26k | £20.69k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £22.39k | £23.38k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/12/1904 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/04/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/10/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/04/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/07/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 APR 2018 as amended on 01 Jul 2020 as amended on 11 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE ART OF SCULPTURE
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Linked charities
- 15 January 1963 : Standard registration
- 23 November 2009 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
108 OLD BROMPTON ROAD
LONDON
SW7 3RA
- Phone:
- 02073738615
- Email:
- info@sculptors.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window