THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE ST ANN'S HOSPITAL AND TOTTENHAM COMMUNITY

Charity number: 213000
Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROVIDE FOR WELFARE OF HOSPITAL PATIENTS AND WIDER COMMUNITY IN TOTTENAHM

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021

Total income: £5
Total expenditure: £18

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Haringey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 November 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE TOTTENHAM HOSPITALS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CLIVE EWART AMOS Chair 17 September 2014
THE TOTTENHAM AND EDMONTON GENERAL DISPENSARY FUND (1990)
Received: On time
MARGARET LINDA DEAN Trustee
None on record
CHAMPAK MISTRY Trustee
EQUATOR LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £94 £118 £183 £121 £5
Total expenditure £0 £36 £72 £54 £18
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 Elysium Court
33 Waverley Road
ENFIELD
Middlesex
EN2 7FP
Phone:
02035244062
Website:

No information available