BARNARDO'S

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Barnardo?s helped improve the lives of more than 240,000 vulnerable children, young people and their families. We help children including those who have been sexually exploited, young people leaving care, children with a parent in prison and provide early intervention for families struggling to cope. We find adoptive homes and foster placements for children in care and campaign to change policy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£326,134,178
Donations and legacies | £41.68m | |
Charitable activities | £187.31m | |
Other trading activities | £93.07m | |
Investments | £3.40m | |
Other | £666.10k |
Total expenditure:
£335,719,911
Raising funds | £99.86m | |
Charitable activities | £235.86m | |
Other | £0 |
£6,000,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £172,197,000 from 870 government contract(s) and £15,115,000 from 52 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £99.86m | |
Charitable expenditure | £235.86m |
People

7784 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
17350 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 73 |
£70k to £80k | 30 |
£80k to £90k | 16 |
£90k to £100k | 11 |
£100k to £110k | 4 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Guernsey
- Jersey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark William Wood | Chair | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Miller Kemp | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Koulla Yiasouma | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bridget OBrien | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Magdalene Akosua Bayim-Adomako | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Henry Chekwube Odogwu | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Meredith Pierce Hunter | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Avis Joy Darzins | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Cecile France Brigitte Berthier | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Briony Marion Ladbury | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Neil Crockett | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Anne Thompson | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rajinder Singh Verma | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £296.45m | £280.46m | £299.50m | £315.25m | £326.13m | |
|
Total expenditure | £297.87m | £286.15m | £278.77m | £312.35m | £335.72m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £162.89m | £167.84m | £164.60m | £169.38m | £172.20m | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.19m | £49.87m | £17.74m | £15.12m | £15.12m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £41.88m | £41.76m | £37.24m | £39.51m | £41.68m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £77.92m | £30.05m | £77.79m | £87.89m | £93.07m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £173.09m | £179.29m | £179.69m | £184.49m | £187.31m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £10.27m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.74m | £2.49m | £2.00m | £3.11m | £3.40m | |
|
Income - Other | £822.00k | £26.87m | £2.79m | £250.15k | £666.10k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £18.03m | £18.57m | £17.19m | £19.21m | £18.45m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £214.60m | £212.69m | £202.44m | £227.04m | £235.86m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £77.17m | £68.76m | £72.13m | £85.31m | £99.86m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.20m | £1.78m | £3.02m | £3.97m | £4.13m | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £300.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £392.00k | £276.00k | £209.00k | £245.22k | £383.26k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £6.10m | £4.70m | £4.20m | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £34.63m | £33.49m | £30.25m | £31.05m | £35.35m | |
|
Long-term investments | £77.21m | £75.91m | £80.10m | £97.96m | £99.49m | |
|
Other assets | £69.32m | £96.42m | £111.72m | £81.44m | £66.94m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£117.58m | -£106.78m | -£52.18m | -£79.88m | -£57.68m | |
|
Total liabilities | £47.17m | £69.73m | £67.49m | £65.63m | £67.26m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/12/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/07/2001 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/07/2011 as amended on 09 Oct 2018 as amended on 29 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1 TO PROMOTE THE CARE, SAFETY AND UPBRINGING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY:- 1.1 SUPPORTING AND ASSISTING THOSE IN NEED, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; 1.2 PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH; AND 1.3 ADVANCING THEIR EDUCATION. 2 THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- A L LILLY (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING FOR BOYS)
- AGNES FANNY TAYLOR
- AILEEN CONGREVE (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING FOR BOYS)
- ALICE AUGUSTA ARNOTT FUND
- ANCHORAGE MISSION
- ANNE DU BOIS FUND
- BARNARDO'S EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING FUND
- BARNARDO'S ENDOWED GENERAL PURPOSE FUND
- BARNARDO'S HOLIDAY AND ADVENTURE FUND
- BARNARDO'S LEAVING CARE FUND
- BARNARDO'S OPPORTUNITY FUND
- BARNARDO'S SEA TRAINING FUND
- BARNARDO'S VILLAGE CHARITY
- BEATRICE BUTTERFIELD (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING OF BOYS)
- BOYS' REFUGE
- C H MIDDLETON MEMORIAL TRUST
- C M MILLS (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING FOR BOYS)
- CAMBRIDGE COTTAGE HOME FUND
- CAPTAIN MIKE HATCHER TRUST
- CAROLINE MARTHA ARNOTT TRUST FUND
- CHARLES ALFRED BLACKBURN
- CHARLES TODD
- CONSTANCE SARAH FINCH (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING FOR BOYS)
- DAME PIERSONS FUND
- DONZEL EMIGRATION FUND
- DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING OF BOYS
- DR ESSIE WINIFRED MEWBERRY (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING FOR BOYS)
- DR S C NOBLE
- EASTERN COUNTIES CHILDRENS CONVALESCENT HOME FUND
- ELDRED W WILSON FOUNDED 1914 (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING FOR BOYS)
- ELDRED W WILSON FOUNDED 1917 (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING FOR BOYS)
- ELIZA JANE SAUNDERS
- ELIZABETH BUCKLAND LAWS
- ELLEN EMILY DE ZOETE
- F J RATCLIFFE
- FENNICK S WATTS (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING FOR BOYS)
- GEORGE ALBERT DRAKE'S DR BARNARDO'S CHARITY
- GEORGE MOORE FUND
- GEORGE W HAYES (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING FOR BOYS)
- GEORGE WILLIAM WILSON
- GOODFELLOW EDUCATIONAL BEQUEST
- GRACE HELENA GIMSON ALICE MARY GIMSON (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING FOR BOYS)
- H S BUCKLEY BEQUEST
- HAROLD MARTIN CLIFF
- HARTS BEQUEST
- HELEN MOORE (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING FOR BOYS)
- HENRY SYLLA BICKLEY (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING OF BOYS)
- HILDA CLARE HEATHCOTE (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING FOR BOYS)
- ISAAC DEWHIRST BEQUEST
- J M STODDART (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING FOR BOYS)
- JULIE THOMAS
- LIVERPOOL CHILDREN'S CHARITY
- LUCY CAROLINE GEE (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING FOR BOYS)
- MARGARETTA MAYERS FOUNDATION
- MARY MARGARET BARONESS SEAFORTH OF BRAHAN
- MARY WRIGHTSON
- MAY PYMAN (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING FOR BOYS)
- MICHAEL HUBERT TETLEY BEQUEST
- MISS J AITKEN'S GIFT
- MISS MCAULAY'S GRIFT
- MR AND MRS FRANCIS JACOB (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING FOR BOYS)
- MR AND MRS J CROMPTON'S ENDOWMENT (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING OF BOYS)
- MRS C E NORMAN (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING FOR BOYS)
- MRS C P LANDALE'S BEQUEST
- MRS M I SIMPSON'S LEGACY
- MRS MANN CONVALESCENT HOME BEDS ENDOWMENT FUND
- MRS MANN CRECHE BEDS ENDOWMENT FUND
- MRS MARIA ADAM (NEE DENNISON) MEMORIAL BEQUEST
- MRS O P TURNER (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING FOR BOYS)
- MUSTARD SEED FUND
- OLIVIA SMITH (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING FOR BOYS)
- REVEREND ROBERT HENRY CHARLES (THE LILIAS TRUST)
- REVEREND THOMAS TURNER
- RIPON HOME FOR GIRLS
- ROBERT COCKERILL HOWELLS (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING FOR BOYS)
- ROBERT CRANSTON PEATTIE (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING FOR BOYS)
- SAMUEL GOLLIN (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING FOR BOYS)
- SIR MERTON AND LADY RUSSELL-COTES GIFT
- SIR ROBERT GLANFIELD GIFT
- THE BARNARDO'S VILLAGE CHARITY
- THE DONALD MACINNES MEMORIAL FUND
- THE FREELAND CHRISTMAS OUTING
- THE GEORGE NICHOL CHARITY FOR BARNARDO'S
- THE GODFREY BIRD TRUST
- THE GORDON MEMORIAL FUND
- THE INNES TRUST FUND
- THE RUTHERFORD TREAT
- THE SWAIN TRUST
- THEODORE ALPHONSE POIROTTE
- THOMAS AND HARRIET HARDING TRUST
- THOMAS WALL FUND
- W B SHEPHERD AND ADA PRICKMAN CHARITY
- WILLIAM JOHNSTON FUND (DR BARNARDO'S CHARITIES FOR SEA TRAINING FOR BOYS)
- 29 July 1968 : Standard registration
- 28 January 1999 : Removed
- 28 January 1999 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
Barnardo's
Tanners Lane
Barkingside
ILFORD
ESSEX
IG6 1QG
- Phone:
- 0800 008 7005
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window