WHITCHURCH RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity Number: 218203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO RELEIVE INDIVIDUAL PERSONS IN THE PARISH OF WIRSALL IN CHESHIRE AND THE PARISHES OF WHITCHURCH URBAN AND RURAL SHROPSHIRE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,801
Total expenditure: £1,395

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 February 1984: Standard registration
  • 19 August 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 03 October 2011: Re-registered
  • 09 August 2022: Funds received from 221055 EARL OF BRIDGEWATER'S CHARITY
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE BROUGHALL ESTATE CHARITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Chris Precious Chair 13 March 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ALKMUND'S, WHITCHURCH. SHROPSHIRE.
Received: 80 days late
Louise Morgan Trustee 08 November 2019
None on record
SHIELA MARTINSON Trustee 03 April 2013
ASH SCHOOL HOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
PAULINE STOKES Trustee 23 January 2012
WHITCHURCH FOODBANK
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF WHITCHURCH COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (SHROPSHIRE)
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ALKMUND'S, WHITCHURCH. SHROPSHIRE.
Received: 80 days late
WHITCHURCH FOODBANK
Recently registered
JOHN STOKES Trustee 23 January 2012
None on record
SUSAN MCKEON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.45k £1.97k £3.53k £24.14k £1.80k
Total expenditure £1.72k £1.02k £2.23k £12.34k £1.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 Heronbrook
Whitchurch
SY13 1BE
Phone:
01948666554
Website:

No information available