THE STONOR FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The chapel is Roman Catholic a semi public oratory mass is celebrated every Sunday and on Holy days. All services are open to the public the chapel is available for weddings, baptism and funerals. Collections are regularly for the benefit of other charities such as Cafod.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 03 December 1963: Standard registration
- Stonor Chapel Foundation (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORD RALPH WILLIAM ROBERT THOMAS CAMOYS | Chair |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.94k | £6.00k | £10.41k | £11.97k | £10.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.20k | £16.45k | £12.05k | £13.52k | £13.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 July 2024 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5TH SEPTEMBER 1962
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ARE CONDUCIVE TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CATHOLIC RELIGION IN THE CATHOLIC PARISH OF WATLINGTON OXON.
Area of benefit
WATLINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
STONOR PARK
STONOR
HENLEY-ON-THAMES
RG9 6HF
- Phone:
- 01491639348
- Email:
- suegill@stonor.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window