POOR'S ESTATE

Charity Number: 220774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Distribution of funds yearly to elderly residents within the Parish of Rise.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £228
Total expenditure: £571

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • East Riding Of Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 April 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hugh Bethell Trustee
THE TRIBUNE TRUST
Received: On time
SARAH BETHELL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £207 £211 £314 £220 £228
Total expenditure £608 £408 £408 £370 £571
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 April 2024 170 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
RISE PARK
SKIRLAUGH
HULL
EAST YORKSHIRE
HU11 5BL
Phone:
01964562241
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available