THE SAINT JOHN'S WOOD SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To encourage the preservation, development and improvement of features of general public amenity or historic interest in St. John's Wood.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 15 January 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Taggart | Chair | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth TREHARNE JONES | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christina Mavrokefalou Diamanti | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Lecacheur | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Frind Cragoe | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melvyn Jo Meade-Brunas | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sanji De Alwis | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jane Leaver | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Edward Hewitt | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Poser | Trustee | 13 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
VIRGINIA NEWMAN | Trustee | 01 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE COWDRAY | Trustee | 26 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.44k | £12.69k | £16.29k | £26.80k | £25.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.07k | £8.16k | £11.57k | £21.62k | £21.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £978 | N/A | £2.36k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/09/1963 AS AMENDED ON 16/05/2005 AS AMENDED ON 20/09/2011
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE HIGH STANDARDS OF ARCHITECTURE AND TOWN PLANNING IN ST. JOHN'S WOOD AND STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST AND CARE FOR THE BEAUTY, HISTORY AND CHARACTER OF ST. JOHN'S WOOD.
Area of benefit
ST. JOHN'S WOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Laurence Lecacheur
14A Abercorn Place
LONDON
NW8 9XP
- Phone:
- 00
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window