EVERGREEN HALL

Charity number: 233402
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Main Activities include provision of a meeting place for:- 1. The Dance Group 2. The Whist Group 3. The OAP's meeting place Provides a meeting place for many charitable groups and for events for the over 50's

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £409
Total expenditure: £3,485

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Bridgend

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 July 1969: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Geoffrey Edwin Cheetham Chair 14 September 2022
None on record
Christine Cook Trustee 14 September 2022
None on record
Beryl Channin Trustee 14 May 2019
None on record
Veronica Norris Trustee 24 January 2019
None on record
CLIFFORD LEWIS Trustee 08 June 2018
None on record
PATRICIA PHIPPS Trustee 08 June 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.81k £29.67k £178 £181 £409
Total expenditure £24.57k £23.16k £10.44k £2.37k £3.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.75k £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 Bedw Arian
BRIDGEND
Mid Glamorgan
CF31 4TP
Phone:
07463649335