DEWSBURY AND DISTRICT SICK POOR FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity gives grants for household goods, holidays to aid recuperation after illness, vouchers for food and clothing and the purchase of medical aids.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Kirklees
Governance
- 09 March 1966: Standard registration
- CARDWELL ANGELS (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STUART BROWN | Chair |
|
||||||||
Suzanne Amanda Baker | Trustee | 04 August 2023 |
|
|||||||
IRIS MARY BETTNEY CERT CIH | Trustee | 09 November 2017 |
|
|||||||
MARGARET WATSON optional | Trustee |
|
||||||||
David Keith SHAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DOLORES BERNARDETTE MULRENNAN optional | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.01k | £4.75k | £4.70k | £4.61k | £4.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.20k | £14.47k | £10.50k | £15.68k | £23.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 19TH FEBRUARY, 1960 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 12TH. JANUARY 1966. as amended on 25 Apr 2023as amended on 25 Apr 2023as amended on 24 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
BENEFIT OF THE SICK POOR IN THE AREA COMPRISING THE COUNTY BOROUGH OF DEWSBURY AND THAT PART OF THE ECLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HANGING HEATON WHICH IS OUTSIDE THE COUNTY BOROUGH.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
130 BOOTHROYD LANE
DEWSBURY
WF13 2LW
- Phone:
- 01924463308
- Email:
- alanwwayside@talktalk.net
- Website:
-
alanwwaysidetalktalk.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window