CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF LIBRARY AND INFORMATION PROFESSIONALS BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 237352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The relief of poverty, sickness and other kinds of suffering amongst librarian and information services workers and their dependants.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £15,039
Total expenditure: £7,773

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 June 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF INFORMATION AND LIBRARY PROFESSIONALS BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
  • THE LIBRARY ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Vincent HonFCLIP Chair 01 January 2020
None on record
JOSEPHINE MARGARET WEBB MLib FCLIP Trustee 30 October 2023
None on record
Dr Rosalie Sian King Trustee 30 October 2023
FRIENDS OF THE NEWPORT SHIP
Received: On time
SOUTH WALES RECORD SOCIETY
Received: On time
VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
David Stewart FCLIP, MBE Trustee 15 February 2022
None on record
Ayub Khan MBE Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
Richard Michael Osborn Trustee 01 January 2018
NEW BARNET PAROCHIAL SCHOOLS TRUST
Received: On time
MOUNT VERNON POST-GRADUATE MEDICAL CENTRE
Received: On time
CHANDOS CHAMBER CHOIR
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF POTTERS BAR
Received: On time
Stephanie Kenna Ms. Trustee 01 January 2018
THE FRIENDS OF THE BRITISH LIBRARY
Received: On time
THE BRITISH LIBRARY COLLECTIONS TRUST
Received: On time
Judith Clare Smith-Blow MA MCLIP Trustee 13 October 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £38.87k £9.44k £7.70k £9.70k £15.04k
Total expenditure £13.82k £6.04k £4.82k £8.46k £7.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WISTERIA COTTAGE
NADDERWATER
EXETER
EX4 2JQ
Phone:
01484866697