THE OLD PLYMOTHIAN AND MANNAMEADIAN LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 239577
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The relief of poor and distressed masons or their widows and children or for the benefit of such masonic charities or other charitable institutions, societies and objects as the lodge shall direct.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £1,314
Total expenditure: £1,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 January 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR J P SMERDON Chair
None on record
NICHOLAS JOHN HOLMAN Trustee 21 September 2016
ROUTEWAYS CENTRE LIMITED
Received: On time
Havencare Homes and Support Limited
Received: On time
MR J J FOSTER Trustee 03 March 2015
None on record
MR B P BROOKSHAW Trustee 03 March 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.27k £1.20k £2.32k £804 £1.31k
Total expenditure £1.10k £2.05k £1.50k £1.00k £1.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 November 2022 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 March 2022 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 September 2021 317 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
91 BEARSDOWN ROAD
EGGBUCKLAND
PLYMOUTH
PL6 5TT
Phone:
01752777044
Website:

No information available