THE PILLING TRUST FUND

Charity number: 241812
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity awards grants to churches within the Anglican communion and other institutions in order to further its objectives.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £376,148
Total expenditure: £195,348

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 June 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE JOHN PILLING TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN MARTIN SUTCLIFFE Chair
None on record
Dr Maximillian Elliott Trustee 11 November 2021
None on record
Rev PETER HOWELL-JONES Trustee 05 November 2015
THE ASSOCIATION OF ENGLISH CATHEDRALS
Received: On time
BLACKBURN CATHEDRAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE BLACKBURN DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED
Received: On time
THE PEEL FOUNDATION SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Received: On time
LIVESEY'S EXHIBITION ENDOWMENT
Received: On time
THE LANTERN MUSIC TRUST
Charity reporting is overdue by 87 days
CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN BLACKBURN
Recently registered
PROFESSOR IAN GRAHAM TRACEY Trustee 31 March 2011
None on record
ANDREW JAMES PALMER Trustee 12 November 2009
None on record
Dr SIMON GEOFFREY LINDLEY FRCO Trustee
THE SHEFFIELD AND DISTRICT ORGANISTS AND CHOIRMASTERS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
ANNE MELINDA ELDER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £356.06k £307.80k £314.90k £321.72k £376.15k
Total expenditure £224.35k £288.17k £232.72k £238.82k £195.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 05 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 05 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 05 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 13 March 2023 36 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 03 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Suite 16b
The Beehive Lions Drive
Blackburn
Lancashire
Phone:
01254686600
Website:

No information available