COMMUNITY OF ST ANDREW

Charity number: 244321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The mission of the Community is the offering of worship and the evangelisation of God's people through the ministry of word, sacrament and practical service. This ministry, ordained or lay, may be exercised in parochial, institutional and social fields. The Community undertakes work in the Diocese of London, and may work elsewhere with the consent of the Bishop of the diocese concerned.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £378,571
Total expenditure: £284,125

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 January 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE DEACONESS COMMUNITY OF ST ANDREW (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Catherine Duce Trustee 06 November 2024
None on record
Miranda Jane Richards Trustee 09 May 2023
None on record
Sister MARGARET CLAIRE HARRIS Trustee 17 May 2018
None on record
Rev GRAHAM MARTIN BUCKLE Trustee 10 March 2014
SION COLLEGE
Received: On time
ST ANDREWS CHURCH HALL TRUST
Received: On time
THE BURDETT-COUTTS, TOWNSHEND AND ST STEPHEN'S SCHOOLS, WESTMINSTER
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN WITH ST JOHN, WESTMINSTER
Received: On time
MRS REBECCA ALDRIDGE
Received: On time
THE PEPYS TWINING TRUST
Received: On time
THE NAPIER HALL TRUST
Received: On time
Dr PETA DUNSTAN Trustee 10 July 2013
ANGLICAN RELIGIOUS COMMUNITIES DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
MISS M M WINTER'S FIRST TRUST
Received: On time
SAINT MARGARET'S CONVENT (SSM CHISWICK) CIO
Received: On time
NICHOLAS WILLIAM LINES Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS WITH ST MARY MAGDALENE, CHISWICK
Received: On time
CROSSLIGHT ADVICE
Received: On time
CHISWICK MONEY ADVICE CENTRE
Received: On time
THE REVEREND CANON FLORA JANE LOUISE WINFIELD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £352.86k £325.65k £350.06k £328.98k £378.57k
Total expenditure £534.66k £596.54k £526.72k £560.65k £284.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 23 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 December 2023 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 December 2023 34 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 STONE BUILDINGS
LINCOLN'S INN
LONDON
WC2A 3TH
Phone:
02076914000
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available