SOCIETY FOR ABANDONED ANIMALS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The SAA takes in unwanted and abandoned animals (currently cats and rabbits). We provide care and veterinary treatment for them until we find them new homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 February 1967: Standard registration
- THE PEGGY HENDERSON ANIMAL SANCTUARY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Tate-Smith | Chair | 15 August 2011 |
|
|||||
Sarah Jayne Twibell | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Blaber | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Catriona Alexandra Granger | Trustee | 12 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ellis | Trustee | 11 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Barry-John Saunders | Trustee | 11 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £223.52k | £233.24k | £145.51k | £358.38k | £169.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £164.78k | £100.64k | £72.85k | £173.28k | £235.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 NOVEMBER 1966 VARIED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 27 SEPTEMBER 2001 AND 11 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SHELTER, FOOD, VETERINARY ATTENTION AND HOMES FOR ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION ABANDONED BY THEIR OWNERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MOSLEY ACRE FARM
STRETFORD
MANCHESTER
M32 9UP
- Phone:
- 0161 973 5318
- Email:
- office@saarescue.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window