SYDNEY SIMMONS HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit, the relief of financial hardship of people in the beneficial class by the provision of almshouse accommodation and ancillary equipment, services and financial relief for almspersons appointed from the class of beneficiaries i.e. people in financial hardship of good character, including but not exclusively, those who have worked in the carpet trade
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 26 April 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Charles Oliver | Chair | 16 March 2023 |
|
|||||||
Virginia Linda Leary | Trustee | 03 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Laura Elizabeth Farquhar | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Vivien Ann Redman | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Khalid Kamal Ismael | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.14k | £110.62k | £110.96k | £121.37k | £130.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.66k | £70.69k | £110.96k | £71.65k | £68.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 21ST MAY 1992 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11 OCTOBER 2010.
Charitable objects
FOR ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WITH A PREFERENCE FOR POOR MEN WHO HAVE WORKED IN THE CARPET TRADE
Area of benefit
UNRESTRICTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The White Cottage
Crampshaw Lane
ASHTEAD
Surrey
KT21 2UD
- Phone:
- 07973 257375
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window