MANCHESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity number: 249424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

MANCHESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE AIMS TO PROMOTE, FACILITATE ADN ASSIST WITH THE WORK AND PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE DIOCESE OF MANCHESTER AND ELSEWHERE

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bolton
  • Bury
  • Manchester City
  • Oldham
  • Rochdale
  • Salford City
  • Stockport
  • Tameside
  • Trafford
  • Wigan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 September 1966: Standard registration
  • 03 November 2015: Funds received from 526405 J B STELFOX TRUST FUND
  • 03 May 2016: Funds received from 232430 RINGLEY CHAPEL ESTATE
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

24 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrea Pollock Trustee 20 March 2025
None on record
Rev Kathreen Shahbaz Trustee 15 March 2025
None on record
Philippa Catherine Bull Trustee 15 March 2025
None on record
Jessica Leaf Trustee 15 March 2025
None on record
Philip Billson Trustee 15 March 2025
None on record
John Solomon Trustee 15 March 2025
None on record
Dr Louise Ruth Smail Trustee 15 March 2025
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES & EMMANUEL, DIDSBURY
Received: On time
Rev Paul Hutchins Trustee 01 January 2025
CONFRATERNITY OF THE BLESSED SACRAMENT
Received: 10 days late
FORWARD IN FAITH
Received: On time
MANCHESTER DIOCESAN CHURCH OF ENGLAND COUNCIL FOR SOCIAL AID
Received: On time
MANCHESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
Received: On time
Richard Molyneux Lewis Trustee 01 January 2025
ECCLES PARISH CHURCH EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW ECCLES MANCHESTER
Received: On time
ECCLES STREET PASTORS
Received: On time
AMY MARIA PRITCHARD
Received: On time
Rev Amy Elizabeth Sheridan Trustee 01 January 2025
None on record
Canon John Walsh Trustee 19 October 2024
CANON SLADE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER BOLTON-LE-MOORS
Received: 32 days late
BOLTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
BOLTON PARISH CHURCH REPAIR FUND
Received: On time
BOLTON PARISH EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Venerable Karen Louise Smeeton Trustee 15 September 2024
MANCHESTER DIOCESAN CHURCH OF ENGLAND COUNCIL FOR SOCIAL AID
Received: On time
The Rt Revd Dr Mathew James Porter Trustee 22 June 2023
None on record
PHILIP GELDARD Trustee 19 March 2022
None on record
Rev Andrew Ian Salmon Trustee 01 January 2022
CHAPEL ST COMMUNITY ARTS
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SACRED TRINITY, SALFORD
Received: 20 days late
Rev Grace Ruth Elizabeth Thomas Trustee 01 January 2022
THE MANCHESTER CATHEDRAL VISITOR CENTRE
Received: On time
MANCHESTER CATHEDRAL
Recently registered
LINCOLN THEOLOGICAL INSTITUTE FOR THE STUDY OF RELIGION AND SOCIETY
Received: 21 days late
Rev Paul Henry Sumsion Trustee 01 January 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLCOMBE AND HAWKSHAW
Received: On time
EMMANUEL HOLCOMBE C.E.P. SCHOOL FUND
Received: On time
JEFFREY NORMAN DUNKERLEY Trustee 01 January 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES & EMMANUEL, DIDSBURY
Received: On time
Canon Rachel Mann Trustee 09 October 2021
None on record
Archdeacon Karen Belinda Best Trustee 14 May 2017
ST PETER'S HOUSE CHAPLAINCY
Received: 163 days late
KEITH LEWIS Trustee 18 March 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH, WALMSLEY WITH ST ANDREWS, BROMLEY CROSS
Received: On time
The Right Reverend Mark Davies Trustee 01 January 2017
THE HULME HALL TRUST FOUNDATION
Received: On time
SPRINGHILL HOSPICE (ROCHDALE)
Received: On time
MANCHESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
Received: On time
GREATER MANCHESTER CHURCHES TOGETHER
Charity reporting is overdue by 561 days
GREATER TOGETHER MANCHESTER
Received: On time
THE VERY REVEREND ROGERS MORGAN GOVENDER Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
RT REV DAVID STUART WALKER Trustee 30 November 2013
LINCOLN THEOLOGICAL INSTITUTE FOR THE STUDY OF RELIGION AND SOCIETY
Received: 21 days late
MANCHESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
Received: On time
THE UNITED SOCIETY
Received: On time
MANCHESTER STATISTICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
BISHOP LEE'S SCHOLARSHIP
Received: On time
ST MARY'S AND ST GILES' CENTRE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £14.23m £15.79m £17.85m £19.25m £14.96m
Total expenditure £14.92m £15.06m £16.39m £14.70m £16.09m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.81m £5.71m £5.83m £5.69m £5.79m
Income - Other trading activities £875.00k £749.00k £573.00k £3.22m £91.00k
Income - Charitable activities £4.41m £5.70m £5.38m £5.58m £4.10m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.21m £934.00k £916.00k £1.16m £1.59m
Income - Other £927.00k £2.70m £5.15m £3.61m £3.38m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £24.87k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £14.55m £14.61m £15.93m £14.39m £15.94m
Expenditure - Raising funds £371.00k £455.00k £460.00k £309.00k £147.00k
Expenditure - Governance £41.00k £32.00k £23.00k £37.00k £33.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £173.00k £151.00k £142.00k £218.00k £211.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £93.00k £159.00k £77.00k £100.00k £124.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £25.75m £25.87m £75.48m £86.79m £86.36m
Long-term investments £32.11m £28.48m £32.58m £20.43m £20.53m
Other assets £3.68m £4.44m £7.13m £20.76m £22.57m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£1.69m -£1.06m -£743.00k £0 £0
Total liabilities £2.00m £2.18m £2.61m £1.26m £3.44m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 29 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 December 2022 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 December 2022 52 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Manchester Diocesan Board Of Finance
155-163 The Rock
BURY
Lancashire
BL9 0ND
Phone:
01618281461