THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF UNITARIAN AND FREE CHRISTIAN CHURCHES

Charity number: 250788
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promotion of Religion

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 February 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Zachariah Reuben Amos Baker Trustee 31 August 2024
SOUTH EAST WALES UNITARIAN SOCIETY
Received: On time
Rev Laura Mary Dobson Trustee 31 August 2024
None on record
Sarah Benfield Trustee 20 July 2023
None on record
Alexander John Bates Trustee 06 April 2023
None on record
Rev James Edwards Jo James Trustee 24 April 2021
None on record
Simon Hall Trustee 24 April 2021
None on record
Jennifer Anne Jacobs Trustee 24 April 2021
THE NIGHTINGALE CENTRE (UNITARIAN)
Received: 55 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £1.09m £1.66m £888.92k £1.13m £1.30m
Total expenditure £1.28m £1.08m £1.08m £1.29m £1.29m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £315.71k £1.17m £395.17k £450.20k £545.86k
Income - Other trading activities £78.99k £55.72k £84.94k £75.72k £81.49k
Income - Charitable activities £509.36k £193.04k £132.58k £418.82k £482.91k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £186.98k £166.05k £166.86k £180.44k £186.29k
Income - Other £0 £72.74k £109.37k £1.88k £0
Income - Legacies £4.00k £459.27k £119.29k £11.69k £240.56k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.19m £1.01m £1.04m £1.29m £1.29m
Expenditure - Raising funds £85.50k £68.20k £44.15k £4.54k £4.68k
Expenditure - Governance £51.32k £32.72k £32.53k £43.23k £55.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution £46.25k £107.09k £34.21k £56.03k £36.49k
Expenditure - Investment management £37.49k £34.57k £40.06k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Own use assets £1.72m £1.63m £1.49m £2.57m £2.48m
Long-term investments £7.30m £6.95m £7.99m £6.42m £6.90m
Other assets £530.04k £1.29m £1.27m £1.31m £1.36m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£68.67k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £139.90k £343.43k £184.15k £133.71k £184.45k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 31 July 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 31 July 2024 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 27 October 2023 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 20 December 2023 143 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 08 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 08 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 11 August 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 11 August 2021 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 30 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
RESOLUTION DATED 29 OCTOBER 1937
Charitable objects
UNITARIAN AND ASSOCIATED CHARITABLE AND SOCIAL WELFARE WORK IN INDIA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 21 February 1967 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF UNITARIAN &
ESSEX HALL
1-6 ESSEX STREET
LONDON
WC2R 3HY
Phone:
02072402384