THE ASHFORD MUSIC SOCIETY
Charity Number: 260284
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ARRANGE AND PUT ON CLASSICAL CONCERTS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Total income: £4,390
Total expenditure: £5,602
Fundraising
This charity does not raise funds from the public
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Recreation
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
- Kent
Governance
Registration history:
- 30 January 1970: Standard registration
- 07 October 2015: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
- 07 October 2015: Funds transferred to 1031783 COUNTESS OF MUNSTER MUSICAL TRUST
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.70k | £5.18k | £5.40k | £4.70k | £4.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.64k | £6.72k | £6.46k | £5.34k | £5.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 13 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 16 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 22 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 11 February 2013 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 1960 AS AMENDED AND CONFIRMED AT AGM IN 1965
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE AND ADVANCE INTEREST IN AND KNOWLEDGE OF MUSIC IN ASHFORD AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
ASHFORD AND DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window