THE GREENWICH SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The society reviews and comments on all planning applications in the Greenwich (SE10) area. Its volunteers actively participate in cleaning up graffiti and maintaining small 'street' gardens. Events are organised for members to explore buildings and aspects of the region. A regular newsletter keeps members up to date with relevant planning developments in the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Greenwich
Governance
- 28 January 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NORMAN ROBERT ADAMS | Chair | 19 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
Miles Beamish Storey | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
Catherine Jane Guest | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
David Patrick Scales | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Jacqueline Suzanne Robinson | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Swift | Trustee | 12 January 2021 |
|
|||||||
Lysanne Wilson | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Sheila Keeble | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Philip Ewart Craig | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
TIMOTHY BARNES | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
Dr PIETER THOMAS VAN DER MERWE | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
HELEN MCINTOSH | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
Lesley Clare Hodsdon | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.51k | £10.29k | £9.00k | £14.79k | £14.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.15k | £14.07k | £10.92k | £17.30k | £10.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 03 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 November 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 DEC 1970 AS AMENDED ON 28 SEP 1993 AS AMENDED ON 20 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES IN THE AREA WITHIN LONDON SE10 AND ALSO THE SURROUNDING AREA WHICH SHALL HEREINAFTER BE REFERRED TO AS "THE AREA OF BENEFIT": TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION AND ENHANCEMENT OF THE BUILT ENVIRONMENT AND THE LANDSCAPE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT.
Area of benefit
LONDON SE10 AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 PRIOR STREET
LONDON
SE10 8SF
- Phone:
- 02082935337
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window