DEVON AND EXETER MEDICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION OF SUPPORT FOR MEDICAL EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES IN EXETER, MID, AND EAST DEVON
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 04 May 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Robert Moody | Trustee | 15 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Jane Richards | Trustee | 13 October 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2018 | 01/09/2019 | 01/09/2020 | 01/09/2021 | 01/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.70k | £7.65k | £5.73k | £3.14k | £3.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.10k | £10.65k | £4.08k | £1.98k | £4.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days | |
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 06 July 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2019 | 21 August 2020 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JUN 1964 AS AMENDED ON 08 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MEDICINE IN ALL ITS BRANCHES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Nicholas Priory
The Mint
EXETER
EX4 3BL
- Phone:
- 01392215541
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window