THE C P F TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The income of the Charity is applied to and for the benefit of charitable bodies and charitable purposes at the Trustees discretion. It should be noted that the Trustees will only accept electronic applications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 June 1971: Standard registration
- 07 February 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 07 February 2023: Funds transferred to 1191787 THE CPF TRUST
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.15k | £114.41k | £114.16k | £83.65k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.78k | £108.15k | £106.27k | £2.21m | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 27 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | 27 January 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 03/03/1971 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12/11/2013 as amended on 23 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH LEGALLY CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window