THE DREWRY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports mainly Quaker and other church activites in the UK, and occasionaly overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 January 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Penelope Mary Estall | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Arlene Mellor Gibson | Trustee | 15 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Hugh Sanders | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Tripp | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Margaret Sepping | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.54k | £18.90k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.04k | £700.00k | £1.00k | £0 | £12.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 18 April 2024 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27TH OCTOBER 1971
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND SOCIETIES RECOGNISED AS SUCH BY LAW AND FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES RECOGNISED AS SUCH BY LAW AT SUCH TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Drove Cottage
Long Crichel
WIMBORNE
Dorset
BH21 5JU
- Phone:
- 07490121102
- Email:
- tom12751@me.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window