CHARITY FOR MAINTENANCE OF CHURCHYARD AND OTHER PURPOSES

Charity Number: 263981
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Upkeep of churchyard

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £4,216
Total expenditure: £3,179

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 May 1972: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PEARCE CHURCHYARD TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Madelaine Harrison Hall Miss Trustee 03 March 2022
None on record
Kathryn Louise Slader Tucker Trustee
EXFORD HOUSING TRUST
Received: On time
THE MOTHERS' UNION (DIOCESE OF BATH AND WELLS BRANCH)
Received: On time
THE BATH AND WELLS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Rev DAVID ALEXANDER WEIR Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.93k £4.01k £4.09k £4.20k £4.22k
Total expenditure £4.02k £829 £1.43k £3.86k £3.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 06 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 November 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
STETFOLD ROCKS FARM
EXFORD
MINEHEAD
TA24 7NZ
Phone:
01643831213
Website:

No information available